+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 1987 in the House:
- See H.R.558 .
On February 23, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Select Education.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
On February 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition.
On January 27, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Assistance and Unemployment Compensation.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Social Security.
On January 22, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On January 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Education and Labor.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
- Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor