+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 22, 1987 in the House:
- For Further Action See H.R.3545 .
On December 8, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On December 1, 1987 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On November 20, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 285.
- House Committee on Agriculture Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on The Judiciary Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On November 17, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On November 6, 1987 in the House:
- House Committee on The Judiciary Granted an Extension for Further Consideration Ending not Later Than November 20, 1987.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture Sequentially, for a Period Ending not Later than Nov 20, 87.
On November 4, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Criminal Justice.
On October 15, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary Sequentially, for a Period Ending not Later than Nov 6, 87.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-378 .
On September 23, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 15, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 28, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Mining and Natural Resources.
On June 30, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor