+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 18, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-498.
- Signed by President.
On October 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 6, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On October 3, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1052.
- Committee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Leahy without amendment. Without written report.
On September 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Agriculture. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 23, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Agriculture. Subcommittee on Agricultural Research, and General Legislation was discharged.
On September 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Agricultural Research, Gen. Leg.
On May 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On May 10, 1988 in the House:
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 418 - 0 .
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 366.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-614.
On May 5, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 4, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 2, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On June 29, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor