+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On November 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee on Commission on Security and Cooperation in Europe. Hearings held.
On October 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On September 20, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
On September 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On September 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred for a period ending not later than September 6 2011, to the Subcommittee on Human Resources, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the subcommittee concerned.
On August 30, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Armed Services, Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor