+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 12, 1998 in the House:
- Laid on the table. See S. 1605 for further action.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 412 - 4 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. McCollum moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On May 7, 1998 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 13, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
On November 7, 1997 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On November 5, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor