+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On October 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Insurance, Housing and Community Opportunity.
On September 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition and Horticulture .
On September 12, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On September 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
- Referred to the Subcommittee Indian and Alaska Native Affairs.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On September 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Ways and Means, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, Financial Services, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Financial Services
- Referred to House Agriculture
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor