+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 352.
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4477-4478)
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2793.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4477-4479)
- Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 218.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-296.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 29, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor