+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On October 12, 1989 in the House:
- See H.R.2978 .
On July 20, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 19, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 18, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 13, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 11, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
On June 28, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor