+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (60)
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 424.
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendments en bloc (A003) offered by Mrs. Dingell.
- On agreeing to the Kildee amendment (A004) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 189 (Roll no. 264).
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A004) pursuant to the rule.
- Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Kildee. (consideration: CR H5523-5524, H5527-5528; text: CR H5523)
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Kildee amendment (A004) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 189 (Roll no. 264).
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Kildee amendment (A004) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 189 (Roll no. 264).
- On agreeing to the Dingell amendments (A003) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 412 - 8 (Roll no. 263).
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A003) pursuant to the rule.
- Amendments en bloc (A003) offered by Mrs. Dingell. (consideration: CR H5522-5523, H5526-5527; text: CR H5522)
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Dingell amendments (A003) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 412 - 8 (Roll no. 263).
- Roll call votes on amendments in House
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Dingell amendments (A003) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 412 - 8 (Roll no. 263).
- On agreeing to the Dingell amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 276 - 147, 1 Present (Roll no. 262).
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A002) pursuant to the rule.
- Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mrs. Dingell. (consideration: CR H5520-5522, H5525-5526; text: CR H5520)
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendments en bloc (A002) offered by Mrs. Dingell.
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Dingell amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 276 - 147, 1 Present (Roll no. 262).
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Dingell amendments (A002) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 276 - 147, 1 Present (Roll no. 262).
- On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Rules.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Butterfield amendment (A005) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 206 (Roll no. 265).
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Kildee.
- Amendment agreed to by House: On agreeing to the Butterfield amendment (A005) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 206 (Roll no. 265).
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1170, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Kildee amendment No. 4.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 190 (Roll no. 267).
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 190 (Roll no. 267).
- On motion to recommit Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 202 - 220 (Roll no. 266).
- The previous question on the motion to recommit was ordered pursuant to clause 2(b) of rule XIX.
- Mr. Fulcher moved to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources. (text: CR H5529)
- House amendment offered/reported by: Amendment (A005) offered by Mr. Butterfield.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Butterfield amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Westerman demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1170, the House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Butterfield amendment No. 5.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Kildee amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Westerman demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Dingell amendment en bloc No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mrs. Dingell demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1170, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Dingell amendment en bloc No. 2.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Dingell amendment en bloc No. 1, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Tiffany demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1170, the House proceeded with 20 minutes of debate on the Dingell amendment en bloc No. 1.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2773.
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2543, H.R. 2773 and H.R. 7606. Resolution provides for one hour of general debate on each bill and one motion to recommit. Rule also amends House Resolution 188 by striking "June 17, 2022" and inserting "June 22, 2022".
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1170. (consideration: CR H5507-5530; text: CR H5507-5510)
- On agreeing to the Butterfield amendment (A005) Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 216 - 206 (Roll no. 265).
- The previous question was ordered on the amendment (A005) pursuant to the rule.
- Amendment (A005) offered by Mr. Butterfield. (consideration: CR H5524-5525, H5528; text: CR H5524)
- House amendment offered
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1170 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2543, H.R. 2773 and H.R. 7606. Resolution provides for one hour of general debate on each bill and one motion to recommit. Rule also amends House Resolution 188 by striking "June 17, 2022" and inserting "June 22, 2022".
On June 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 271.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-359.
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
- Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 29 - 15.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 29, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (6)
H.Amdt.218
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.219
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.220
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.221
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.222
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (192)
Type:
Primary Sponsor