+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 7, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 200.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
On November 16, 2001 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 7, 2001.
On November 13, 2001 in the House:
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 16, 2001.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 107-288 , Part I.
On October 11, 2001 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 4, 2001 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 25, 2001 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 16, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On August 8, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On August 3, 2001 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On August 2, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor