+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. King moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2764 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On May 8, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 112-466 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 326.
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On November 15, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On August 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
On August 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor