+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On October 6, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 444.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-783 .
On August 5, 1998 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held.
On October 30, 1997 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Interior.
On October 28, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor