+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-609.
- Signed by President.
On October 27, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 21, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 21, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On May 11, 1988 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On May 10, 1988 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-613.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 365.
- Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 417 - 0 .
On May 5, 1988 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 4, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 25, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On June 23, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor