+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 10, 1998 in the House:
- Became Private Law No: 105-10.
- Signed by President.
On November 2, 1998 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 21, 1998 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 21, 1998 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On September 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 611.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On August 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On August 4, 1998 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered from the Private Calendar.
On July 24, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 13.
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 105-645 .
On October 24, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor