+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On November 24, 1999 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-109.
- Signed by President.
On November 16, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 10, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion.
On November 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Mr. Boehlert moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
On November 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Amendment SP 2773 proposed by Senator Grassley for Senator Warner.
- S.AMDT.2773 Proposed by Senator Grassley for Senator Warner. To improve the bill.
- Amendment SP 2773 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.2773 Amendment SP 2773 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On October 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 316.
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-183 .
On September 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On September 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On August 5, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Shuster asked unanimous consent to consider as introduced.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.2773
To improve the bill.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor