+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 15, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-230.
- Signed by President.
On February 3, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On February 1, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On February 1, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On January 31, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On January 31, 1978 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendments.
On November 3, 1977 in the Senate:
- Call of calendar in Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
On November 1, 1977 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Select Committee on Indian Affairs, S. Rept. 95-575.
On September 23, 1977 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Select Committee on Indian Affairs.
On September 19, 1977 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by consent calendar in House.
On August 4, 1977 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 95-570.
On January 31, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor