+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 9, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 111-178.
On June 1, 2010 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 416 - 0 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 2711 .
- Mr. Lynch moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments.
On May 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- S.AMDT.4043 Amendment SA 4043 proposed by Senator Dodd for Senator Lieberman. In the nature of a substitute.
- Committtee amendments withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- S.AMDT.4044 Amendment SA 4044 proposed by Senator Dodd for Senator Lieberman. To amend the title.
- S.AMDT.4043 Amendment SA 4043 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4044 Amendment SA 4044 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
On December 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 234.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with amendments. Without written report.
On December 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On December 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On December 8, 2009 in the House:
- Mr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2711 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 29, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 155.
- Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 111-274 .
On September 10, 2009 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia Discharged.
On July 31, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia.
On June 4, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Amendments (2)
S.AMDT.4043
In the nature of a substitute.
S.AMDT.4044
To amend the title.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor