+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 9, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 104-159.
On July 2, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 28, 1996 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 27, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 425.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Stevens without amendment. Without written report.
On April 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On December 19, 1995 in the House:
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Mr. McHugh moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On December 14, 1995 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 7, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Postal Service.
On December 5, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor