+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 467.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 113-627.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor