+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 19 (Roll no. 389). (text: 11/30/2021 CR H6687-6688)
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 404 - 19 (Roll no. 389).(text: 11/30/2021 CR H6687-6688)
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6833-6834)
On December 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 30, 2021 in the House:
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-186.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 136.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6687-6689)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2685.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
On July 21, 2021 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 20, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Discharged.
On July 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House