+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 26, 1993 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-114.
- Signed by President.
On October 14, 1993 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 6, 1993 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 5, 1993 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 5, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On September 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On September 21, 1993 in the House:
- Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 15, 1993 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 133.
- Reported by the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. H. Rept. 103-242.
On August 4, 1993 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 22, 1993 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor