+ − Summary
+ − Actions (19)
On October 4, 1988 in the House:
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
- Passed Over by House Without Prejudice.
On September 22, 1988 in the House:
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
- Passed Over by House Without Prejudice.
On August 2, 1988 in the House:
- Passed Over by House Without Prejudice.
On June 8, 1988 in the House:
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
- Passed Over by House Without Prejudice.
On May 3, 1988 in the House:
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
- Passed Over by House Without Prejudice.
On April 19, 1988 in the House:
- Passed Over by House Without Prejudice.
On December 1, 1987 in the House:
- Called up by House on Call of Private Calendar.
- Placed on Private Calendar No: 37.
On November 16, 1987 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-442.
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
On October 7, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 12, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor