+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On October 4, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2681 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Petri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On September 13, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 188.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-313 .
On August 5, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 4, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 3, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Ground Transportation.
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor