+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On February 25, 1997 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets, Securities and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- Hearings held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Hearings held by the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Prior to Referral.
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Finance and Hazardous Materials, and in addition to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On January 7, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services
- Referred to the Committee on Banking and Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor