+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 7, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-229.
- Signed by President.
On March 27, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On March 26, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On March 26, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On March 25, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On March 25, 1980 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to House amendment to certain Senate amendment.
On November 29, 1979 in the Senate:
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendment with an amendment.
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
On November 14, 1979 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On November 9, 1979 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-611.
On August 1, 1979 in the Senate:
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
On July 10, 1979 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On May 23, 1979 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 15, 1979 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Environment and Public Works with amendment, S. Rept. 96-158.
On March 28, 1979 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On March 27, 1979 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
On March 26, 1979 in the House:
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by special rule in House.
On March 20, 1979 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Science and Technology with amendment, H. Rept. 96-58.
On March 7, 1979 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor