+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On October 31, 2002 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On October 28, 2002 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On November 13, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
On August 16, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On July 27, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Education and the Workforce
- Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor