+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On August 1, 1996 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- H.AMDT.1377 On agreeing to the Agriculture amendment Agreed to without objection.
- H.AMDT.1377 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by the Committee on Agriculture. Amendment provides for compensation to the Forest Service for its release of a reversionary interest it holds in land affected by the proposed land exchange contained in the bill.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Allard asked unanimous consent to discharge the Union Calendar and consider.
On June 27, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 324.
- Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 104-644 .
On June 19, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 30, 1996 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 27, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Resource Conservation, Research and Forestry.
On November 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.1377
Amendment provides for compensation to the Forest Service for its release of a reversionary interest it holds in land affected by the proposed land exchange contained in the bill.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor