+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On October 13, 1988 in the House:
- For Further Action See S.59 .
On October 6, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 3, 1987 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Interior.
On June 25, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On March 20, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Interior.
On February 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On January 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor