+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-113.
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 390.
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On December 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On December 14, 2011 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 112-326 .
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 98.
- Mr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2668 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Cummings objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
On October 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On July 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On July 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor