+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On November 12, 2001 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 107-68.
- Signed by President.
On November 2, 2001 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 1, 2001 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference report by Unanimous Consent Vote.
On November 1, 2001 in the House:
- Conference papers: Senate report and manager's statement and message on House action held at the desk in Senate.
- On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 374 - 52 .
- Motions to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The House proceeded to consider the conference report H.Rept. 107-259 as unfinished business.
- VOTE POSTPONED - At the conclusion of debate on the conference report and pursuant to the rule, the Yeas and Nays were ordered on the question of adoption of the conference report. The Chair subsequently postponed further proceedings on the question until later in the legislative day.
- The previous question was ordered without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on the conference report.
- Mr. Taylor brought up conference report H. Rept. 107-259 for consideration under the provisions of H. Res. 273 .
On October 31, 2001 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 273 passed House.
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 273 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of the conference report to H.R. 2647 .
On October 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Conference report H. Rept. 107-259 filed.
- Conferees agreed to file conference report.
On September 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- The Speaker appointed conferees: Taylor , Wamp, Lewis , LaHood, Sherwood, Young , Moran , Hoyer, Kaptur, and Obey.
- On motion that the House disagree to the Senate amendments, and agree to a conference Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Taylor asked unanimous consent that the House disagree to the Senate amendments, and agree to a conference
On August 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 31, 2001 in the House:
- Rule H. Res. 213 passed House.
- H.AMDT.282 Amendment offered by Mr. Traficant. Amendment states that anyone who has been convicted of violating the Buy American Act will be barred from receiving any funds from the bill.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 213 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2647 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Michael K. Simpson to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 213 and Rule XXIII.
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2647 .
- H.AMDT.281 Amendment offered by Mr. Rothman. Amendment allows funds to be used for the installation of compact fluorescent light bulbs in House office buildings.
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 213 , the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rothman amendment.
- H.AMDT.281 On agreeing to the Rothman amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
On July 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate in lieu of S.1172 with amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On July 31, 2001 in the House:
- DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 213 , the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Traficant amendment.
- H.AMDT.282 On agreeing to the Traficant amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2647 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendments en gross as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 380 - 38 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
- Senate struck portions of the text of the bill and inserted the language of S. 1172 amended by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate insists on its amendments, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Durbin, Johnson, Reed, Byrd, Bennett, Stevens and Cochran.
On July 30, 2001 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 213 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2647 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order.
On July 26, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 100.
- The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 107-169 , by Mr. Taylor .
+ − Amendments (2)
H.AMDT.281
Amendment allows funds to be used for the installation of compact fluorescent light bulbs in House office buildings.
H.AMDT.282
Amendment states that anyone who has been convicted of violating the Buy American Act will be barred from receiving any funds from the bill.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor