+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 703.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H755)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2646.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H755-757)
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On December 14, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor