+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 113-244.
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 113-244.
On December 13, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H9293-9294)
- Mr. Walden asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9292-9294)
On December 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4094 Amendment SA 4094 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4094 Amendment SA 4094 proposed by Senator Merkley. (consideration: CR S6622)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6621-6622)
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Introduced in Senate
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On October 29, 2013 in the House:
- Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6850-6851)
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6850-6852)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2640.
On September 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 164.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-224.
On July 24, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Water and Power Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged.
On July 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
On July 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
S.Amdt.4094
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor