+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On September 28, 1998 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 11, 1998 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 14, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Information and Technology.
On October 9, 1997 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On October 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform and Oversight.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor