+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 20, 2022 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 117-243.
- Signed by President.
On December 16, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 7, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7005-7006)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On July 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 278 - 134 (Roll no. 415). (text: 7/28/2022 CR H7388)
On July 29, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 278 - 134 (Roll no. 415).
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7531-7532)
On July 28, 2022 in the House:
- House amendment agreed to: On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- House amendment offered
- Amendment in the nature of a substitute reported by the House Committee on Rules.
- On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1256. (consideration: CR H7388-7395)
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 263 and H.R. 4040. Resolution provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill. H. Res. 517 is considered adopted.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 263.
- DEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 263.
- POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 263, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote, announced the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Westerman demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
On July 26, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1256 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 263 and H.R. 4040. Resolution provides for one hour of general debate and one motion to recommit on each bill. H. Res. 517 is considered adopted.
On July 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 334.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-428.
On June 15, 2022 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 25 - 17.
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendments (2)
All Actions
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
H.Amdt.309
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
+ − Sponsors (258)
Type:
Primary Sponsor