+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On June 27, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On June 6, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 26, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 28, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 25, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
On April 19, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor