+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On November 1, 2000 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-405.
- Signed by President.
On October 20, 2000 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 17, 2000 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion.
On October 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment.
On October 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 13, 2000 in the Senate:
- Measure laid before Senate.
- Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- S.AMDT.4321 Amendment SA 4321 proposed by Senator Lott for Senator McCain. To promote the development of the commercial space transportation industry, and for other purposes.
- S.AMDT.4321 Amendment SA 4321 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On November 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On October 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 4, 1999 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2607 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 29, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 27, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
On July 26, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.4321
To promote the development of the commercial space transportation industry, and for other purposes.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor