+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 113-243.
- Signed by President.
On December 16, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6819)
On December 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On December 11, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9292)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9292)
- Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
- Mr. Brady (TX) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (83)
Type:
Primary Sponsor