+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On August 1, 1996 in the House:
- Committee Withdrew Measure by Unanimous Consent.
- Considered by Committee.
On June 19, 1996 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 14, 1995 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Native American and Insular Affairs.
On November 7, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Eni F. H. Faleomavaega
Type:
Primary Sponsor