+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 29, 1983 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 98-171.
- Signed by President.
On November 18, 1983 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On November 17, 1983 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On November 17, 1983 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On November 15, 1983 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 574.
- Senate Committee on Agriculture discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On August 1, 1983 in the House:
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
On August 1, 1983 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On July 29, 1983 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 211.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 98-335.
On July 26, 1983 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 19, 1983 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 21, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition.
On April 19, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor