+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 7, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 15, 2000.
On December 5, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 7, 2000.
On November 14, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 5, 2000.
On November 4, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 14, 2000.
On November 3, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 4, 2000.
On November 2, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 3, 2000.
On November 1, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 2, 2000.
On October 31, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 1, 2000.
On October 30, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 31, 2000.
On October 29, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 30, 2000.
On October 28, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 29, 2000.
On October 27, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 28, 2000.
On October 26, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 27, 2000.
On October 25, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 26, 2000.
On October 20, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 25, 2000.
On October 13, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 20, 2000.
On October 6, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 13, 2000.
On September 21, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 6, 2000.
On July 20, 2000 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Sept. 22, 2000.
- Reported by the Committee on Commerce. H. Rept. 106-775 , Part I.
On October 13, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 21.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 29, 1999 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 12.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 22, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 4, 1999 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 27, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Finance and Hazardous Materials.
On July 22, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On July 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor