+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-245 , Part I.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 161.
On July 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
On January 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
On January 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor