+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 116.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-160, Part I.
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House