+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On September 21, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-688 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 499.
On December 1, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 0.
On November 20, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged.
On July 26, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 22, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On July 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.