+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On September 26, 2000 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 419 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2572 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Committee on Science discharged.
On September 19, 2000 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics Discharged.
On July 26, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Space and Aeronautics.
On July 20, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor