+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 6, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 206.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 108-278 , Part II.
On October 31, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 7, 2003.
On October 28, 2003 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 3, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 31, 2003.
On September 18, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee on Ways and Means Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Oct. 3, 2003.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-278 , Part I.
On June 25, 2003 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 24, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor