+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mrs. Carolyn B. Maloney (NY) asked unanimous consent that she hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 2569, a bill originally introduced by Representative Cummings, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (118)
Type:
Primary Sponsor