+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 28, 1993 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-54.
- Signed by President.
On July 23, 1993 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 22, 1993 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 21, 1993 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 149.
- Committee on Armed Services. Reported to Senate by Senator Nunn without amendment. Without written report.
- Committee on Armed Services. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 15, 1993 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
On July 14, 1993 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 13, 1993 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hamilton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 30, 1993 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor