+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 1983 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From HHS.
On May 16, 1983 in the House:
- See H.R.3021 .
On May 5, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 22, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 19, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On April 18, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Assistance and Unemployment Compensation.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health.
On April 13, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor