+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 29, 2003 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-62.
- Signed by President.
On July 24, 2003 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 18, 2003 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 17, 2003 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On July 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On July 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 207.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici without amendment. With written report No. 108-99 .
On June 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes debate on H.R. 255 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Radanovich moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor