+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On May 29, 1987 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On March 20, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Interior.
On February 26, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on SBA, and the General Economy.
On February 5, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On January 30, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On January 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Small Business.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor